RAHWA SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping ethnic minorities in general and eritrean in particular. To relieve them from poverty and isolation by addressing their need. Promote projects and schemes, providing them advice and information on health - social walfare etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 29 October 1999: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KIBRAB GHEBRENGUS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
AZEB GHEBREKIDAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MEBRAHTU ARAIA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEZAE YARED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAWIT WELDERUFAEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FANA NEGASH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MERHAWI NEGHASH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.72k | £3.29k | £3.14k | £1.35k | £1.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.74k | £1.06k | £2.08k | £418 | £418 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 17TH MAY 1998
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS OF ERITREAN ORIGIN IN NEED TO RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 THORPE CLOSE
LONDON
W10 5XL
- Phone:
- 07957352684
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window