THIRSK MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF AN OPEN SPACE TO BE KNOWN AS A MILLENNIUM GREEN FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY of Thirsk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2021
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 04 August 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND GEOFFREY TEMPLE BRUCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADELAIDE YORATH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MELANIE COOKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEREK EDWARD ADAMSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr NIGEL GABBOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £60 | £60 | £60 | £74 | £84 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 244 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 244 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 610 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 610 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 30 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 MARCH 1998
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF AN OPEN SPACE TO BE KNOWN AS A MILLENNIUM GREEN FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 GORMIRE CLOSE
THIRSK
YO7 1EW
- Phone:
- 01845523768
- Email:
- dea@thirskweb.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window