ACADEMY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES

Charity number: 1070618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.11m £11.08m £11.85m £14.08m £9.97m
Total expenditure £7.91m £10.19m £11.94m £13.28m £6.40m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.91m £2.97m £5.99m £6.01m £4.61m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.06m £1.55m £977.85k £1.73m £895.11k
Income - Other trading activities £909.24k £933.02k £788.85k £783.03k £265.92k
Income - Charitable activities £6.03m £8.48m £9.97m £11.46m £8.75m
Income - Endowments £0 £138.51k £88.63k £0 £0
Income - Investment £108.04k £116.19k £111.02k £112.90k £68.08k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.11m £9.49m £11.22m £12.57m £6.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds £793.24k £701.01k £717.59k £144.30k £109.35k
Expenditure - Governance £53.83k £33.11k £51.76k £51.39k £95.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution £4.39m £5.97m £7.42m £7.75m £5.19m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £18.56k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £559.65k £0