WORD FOR LIFE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Word for Life Trust is a faith based ministry serving the worldwide church. WFLT works to envision, encourage, equip churches and individual Christians to share the love of God more effectively into their communities. WFLT works only by invitation of local churches and in partnership with them, never in place of them, and inter-denominationally wherever possible (Ps 133:1).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- India
Governance
- 03 September 1998: Standard registration
- ARTSIM (Working name)
- WFLT (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH HAWKINS BSC | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jemma Holloway | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Hawkins | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ANN WINSOR | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Paul Alexander Farrow | Trustee | 23 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS FRAN HAWKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.05k | £41.00k | £59.05k | £40.43k | £45.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.42k | £44.06k | £44.75k | £54.60k | £48.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05/02/1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 28/07/1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 26/04/2007 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 17/09/2011
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, ESPECIALLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE EDUCATION OF CHURCHES IN HEALING COUNSELLING EVANGELISM AND OTHER RELEVANT SUBJECTS
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 17
Old School Place
North Grove
Wells
BA5 2TD
- Phone:
- 01749675426
- Email:
- office@wflt.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window