ST MICHAEL'S CATHOLIC SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1069394
Charity reporting is overdue by 602 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £1.49k £0 £48 £38 £23
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A