FOREST FIELDS WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1072167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 25 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 September 2018 329 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 25 September 2018 694 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required