REFUGEE AID AND DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1077846
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2010 Overdue Overdue by 3722 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2010 Overdue Overdue by 3722 days
Annual return 30 April 2009 07 December 2009 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2008 Overdue Overdue by 4452 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2007 28 February 2008 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2007 15 February 2008 On time
Annual return 30 April 2006 26 February 2007 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2006 26 February 2007 On time