REFUGEE AID AND DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1077846
Removed charity
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2005 30/04/2006 30/04/2007 30/04/2008 30/04/2009
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A