THE CAMBRIDGE ARTS THEATRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1069912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.45m £4.63m £4.91m £5.32m £4.87m
Total expenditure £4.48m £4.27m £4.62m £4.84m £4.62m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £4.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £127.30k £339.96k £240.04k £102.75k £114.90k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £236.52k £265.60k
Income - Charitable activities £4.33m £4.29m £4.67m £4.98m £4.48m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £600 £668 £265 £903 £1.44k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £9.50k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £80.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.40m £4.18m £4.53m £4.75m £4.50m
Expenditure - Raising funds £77.25k £91.04k £90.31k £93.29k £113.80k
Expenditure - Governance £10.75k £11.00k £10.50k £11.00k £11.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0