Dogfen lywodraethu THE CAMBRIDGE ARTS THEATRE TRUST LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/03/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/05/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/01/2000 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31/01/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04/06/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF CAMBRIDGE AND THE SURROUNDING REGION AND ELSEWHERE: 3.1 TO PROMOTE THE ARTS OF DRAMA, DANCE AND MUSIC AND ANY OTHER FORMS OF ART ALLIED TO THE SAME INCLUDING BY PROMOTING AND ARRANGING PERFORMANCES; AND 3.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE ARTS OF DRAMA, DANCE AND MUSIC AND ALLIED ART FORMS THROUGH PROMOTING OR ARRANGING EXHIBITIONS, EVENTS OR OTHER ACTIVITIES WHICH THE TRUSTEES THINK APPROPRIATE.
Maes buddion
CAMBRIDGE AND SURROUNDING REGION AND ELSEWHERE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.