THE CAMBRIDGE ARTS THEATRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1069912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SHAUN GRADY Trustee 09 February 2016
PROSTATE CANCER RESEARCH Received: On time
RUPERT CHRISTIANSEN Trustee 21 June 2016 None on record
LILY JEANETTE BACON Trustee 21 November 2013
EAST ANGLIA'S CHILDREN'S HOSPICES Received: On time
STOREY'S FIELD COMMUNITY TRUST Received: On time
JEFFREY MICHAEL ILIFFE Trustee 13 March 2009 None on record
ANDREW THOMAS SWARBRICK Trustee 11 January 2011
CAMBRIDGE MUSIC FESTIVAL LIMITED Received: On time
THE STRADIVARI TRUST Received: On time
AMANDA JANE FARNSWORTH Trustee 20 June 2017 None on record
IAN PHILIP MATHER Chair 28 March 2010 None on record
LEE DEAN Trustee 26 April 2016 None on record
ADAM MARTIN GLINSMAN Trustee 11 January 2011 None on record
DAVID RAYMOND JOHN RAPLEY Trustee 26 April 2016 None on record
SIR RICHARD DEARLOVE KCMG OBE Trustee 01 March 2017
THE CAMBRIDGE SECURITY INITIATIVE 2017 Received: On time
DR KEITH CARNE Trustee 13 September 2011
THE CHURCH SCHOOLS OF CAMBRIDGE (THE OLD SCHOOLS) Received: On time