ROYAL WEST OF ENGLAND ACADEMY

Charity number: 1070163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
WILL DATED 30/04/1918 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27/01/1982 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01/07/1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION UNDER SECTION 282 OF THE CHARITIES ACT TO RELEASE PERMANENT ENDOWMENT DATED 04/06/2014
Charitable objects
1) THE PURCHASE OF WORKS OF ART FROM BRISTOL ARTISTS FOR THE ROYAL WEST OF ENGLAND ACADEMY IN ORDER TO STIMULATE THE ARTISTIC EFFORTS OF THE MEN AND WOMEN OF BRISTOL. 2) IF AND INSOFAR AS THE CLEAR INCOME CANNOT BE USEFULLY APPLIED FOR THE ABOVE PURPOSES, THE TRUSTEE SHALL APPLY THE SURPLUS IN OR TOWARDS THE UPKEEP OR MAINTENANCE OF THE ACADEMY OR IN OR TOWARDS THE EXTENSION, ENHANCEMENT, CONSERVATION, STORAGE & MAINTENANCE OF THE PERMANENT COLLECTION OF THE ACADEMY.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL
Registration history
  • 28 June 2007 : Standard registration