Trustees ROYAL WEST OF ENGLAND ACADEMY
Charity number: 1070163

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathleen Forgan Curling | Chair | 05 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Michael Perry | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Elizabeth DeNiro | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Douglas Russell | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Joanna Louise Marston Wyld | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|||||
John Rowland Vasey | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dallas Joseph Collins | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Patrick Finch | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nerys Ann Watts | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Fiona Patricia Robinson | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abdulhamid Sheikh | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Elena Marco | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Yvonne Ashton | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.