Dogfen lywodraethu LINCOLNSHIRE COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY SERVICE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/02/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/11/2011 as amended on 23 Nov 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICTS OF BOSTON, SOUTH HOLLAND AND SOUTH KESTEVEN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; (2) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Maes buddion
BOSTON, SOUTH HOLLAND AND SOUTH KESTEVEN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.