Trustees LINCOLNSHIRE COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY SERVICE

Charity number: 1069356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Christopher Latham Chair 17 March 2021
BRAYFORD TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Henry Wright Trustee 05 October 2023
None on record
Axel Sedgwick Trustee 05 October 2023
None on record
Oana Cunningham Trustee 05 October 2023
None on record
Peter John Bateson Trustee 01 June 2021
THE WINTHORPE COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: 21 days late
ANN COXALL Trustee 22 March 2019
None on record
Stephen Hall Trustee 04 January 2018
None on record
Julie Anne Ellis Trustee 30 August 2017
None on record
Canon Stephen Douglas Holdaway Trustee 21 March 2012
ROTARY CLUB OF ALFORD AND MABLETHORPE TRUST FUND
Received: On time
OSTCLIFFE PALMER TRUST
Received: On time