SAHWR

Charity number: 1069612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £540.72k £510.45k £583.92k £548.35k £786.14k
Total expenditure £494.54k £508.98k £687.11k £587.61k £637.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £156.58k £181.25k £195.56k
Income from government grants £217.23k £211.57k £54.00k £90.90k £84.90k
Income - Donations and legacies £30.86k £22.14k £97.52k £80.28k £203.65k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £147 £0 £0 £236
Income - Charitable activities £509.73k £486.68k £485.30k £467.87k £582.12k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £128 £1.48k £1.09k £204 £138
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £80.28k £203.65k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £462.25k £466.95k £626.31k £568.91k £637.87k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £15.96k £11.40k £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.81k £8.55k £7.78k £11.19k £9.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £32.29k £42.03k £44.84k £7.30k £0