Trustees CARE FOR CHILDREN

Charity number: 1072199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JONATHAN HUMPHREY CAMPBELL SCOTT Chair
None on record
Liu Liu Trustee 23 November 2022
None on record
NICHOLAS CHANCE LVO, JP Trustee 01 February 2018
THE CLOUD TRUST
Overdue by 26 days
Lorne Armstrong Trustee 18 December 2017
None on record
EDWARD AMIES Trustee 03 November 2016
NEWDAY UNITED
Received: On time
VINESONG MINISTRIES
Received: On time
David Devenish Trustee 08 June 2016
None on record
Michael Bonehill Trustee 08 June 2016
None on record
Mark Stolkin Trustee 17 May 2016
None on record
Susan Johns Trustee 24 March 2015
None on record
Dr ROBERT GLOVER OBE Trustee
None on record