THE BLUE DOLPHIN CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Blue Dolphin Club provides about 18 adults with learning disabilities, with a regular club night, during which the members can participate in games, sports, arts & crafts, drama and other activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Poole
Governance
- 15 May 1998: Standard registration
- 10 December 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.98k | £4.87k | £3.80k | £2.55k | £1.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.53k | £6.30k | £5.36k | £4.53k | £4.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 12 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | 08 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | 08 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2017 | 03 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 MARCH 1998.
Charitable objects
IN THE BOROUGH OF POOLE AND SURROUNDING AREA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE AGED 16 YEARS UPWARDS WITH THE LEARNING DIFFICULTIES TO INVOLVE THEM AS MUCH AS POSSIBLE IN THE OPERATION OF RUNNING A CLUB. TO PROVIDE ENTERTAINMENT FOR THE MEMBERS, TO INTEGRATE THEM INTO SOCIETY, AND TO IMPROVE THEIR EDUCATION WHEREVER POSSIBLE AND TO TREAT THEM AS NORMAL PEOPLE..
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF POOLE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window