Accounts and annual returns THE ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY, SOUTH WALES BRANCH

Charity number: 1069188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 24 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 24 October 2020 262 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 01 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required