Trustees THE ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY, SOUTH WALES BRANCH

Charity number: 1069188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CONOR FARMER Chair
None on record
Carol Shirley Walton Trustee 15 June 2019
THE NIGHTINGALE FELLOWSHIP
Received: On time
Liz Mozdiak Trustee 16 June 2018
None on record
Jean Elliot Trustee 17 June 2016
None on record
Anthony Harland Trustee 20 June 2015
None on record
ANN MORGAN Trustee 25 November 2012
None on record
FRAN SMITH Trustee
None on record
ALISON JACKSON Trustee
None on record
MRS PAT RYE Trustee
None on record