Accounts and annual returns URBAN PARTNERSHIP GROUP

Charity number: 1092258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 February 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 February 2021 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 06 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window