Financial history SEAFORD HEAD SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1069186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £1.28k £6.45k £7.83k £108 £80
Total expenditure £230 £5.18k £8.38k £266 £106
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A