CHRISTIAN SURFERS UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1070830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV DAVE MATTHEWS Trustee
CROYDE BAPTIST CHURCH Recently registered
MR MIKE SCOTT Trustee None on record
BRIAN ISAAC ALLEN Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
ALICE ELIZABETH LOUISE OVENDEN Trustee 10 February 2014 None on record
Philip Williams Trustee 28 March 1998
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, NAILSEA Received: On time
Chelsea Jade Elizabeth Holter Trustee 09 June 2020 None on record
JOSHUA COLE Trustee 17 March 2018 None on record
ANDREW SWIFT Trustee 07 February 2014
SHARE JESUS Received: On time
ROBERT CHARLES CROUCH Trustee 09 June 2020
HOPE 4 THE WORLD Received: On time