THE S.W. CLIVE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1075821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 04 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 14 March 2019 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 12 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required