THE F AND E HARRIS MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Christmas hampers to senior citizens of South Marston 2. Annual excursion for senior citizens of South Marston 3. Funding for South Marston Recreation Association 4. Funding for South Marston Tots-n-Toddlers group 5 Transport scheme for senior citizens of South Marston 6. Village Youth Club 7. Educational needs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Swindon
Governance
- 26 June 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Hole | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBINA ANN TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Irena Skapin Osborne | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Beaver | Trustee | 28 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD SANSUM | Trustee | 15 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.56k | £42.03k | £45.58k | £52.38k | £58.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.87k | £42.42k | £61.81k | £39.58k | £61.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 JUNE 1998 AND DEED OF VARIATION DATED 6 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS SICKNESS OR ILL-HEALTH.PROVIDE ( OR CONTRIBUTE TOWARDS THE PROVISION MAINTENANCE IMPROVEMENT OR REPAIR OF) PUBLIC RECREATION GROUNDS PLAYING FIELDS SWIMMING POOLS CHURCHES VILLAGE HALLS COMMUNITY CENTRES AND OTHER BUILDINGS OR FACILITIES AVAILABLE FOR THE USE OF THE RESIDENTS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT OR ANY OF THEM TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS RESIDENT OR WHOSE PARENTS OR GUARDIANS ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN CONNECTION WITH THEIR EDUCATION, FURTHER EDUCATION OR PROFESSIONAL OR VOCATIONAL TRAINING AT ANY APPROPRIATE EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT..
Area of benefit
SOUTH MARSTON AND/OR STRATTON ST MARGARET IN THE BOROUGH OF SWINDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Highview
Thornhill Road
South Marston
SWINDON
SN3 4RY
- Phone:
- 01793823757
- Email:
- robina.taylor@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
highviewthornhillroadsouthmarston.wilts
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window