THE JORDAN BOND MEMORIAL FUND
Charity number: 1070372
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holding Golf Events to raise money for the Charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2013
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
Registration history:
- 03 July 1998: Standard registration
- 21 April 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 21 April 2015: Funds transferred to 1079049 CYSTIC FIBROSIS TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2009 | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | 20 June 2014 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | 26 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | 17 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 MARCH 1998
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN WITH CYSTIC FIBROSIS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT OTHERWISE BY THE PROVISION OF HOLIDAYS FOR THE SUFFERERS AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window