KAIROS PRISON MINISTRY UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The mission of Kairos Prison Ministry is to bring Christ's love and forgiveness to all imprisoned individuals, their families, those that work with them and to assist in the transition of becoming a productive citizen.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 09 September 1998: Standard registration
- KAIROS UK (Working name)
- KAIROS UNITED KINGDOM DISTRICT COMMITTEE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Stephens | Chair | 23 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Simon Ian Williams | Trustee | 08 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.70k | £5.69k | £4.97k | £6.67k | £2.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.86k | £4.09k | £1.97k | £3.31k | £4.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17 MARCH 1998 AS AMENDED 17 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
ADVANCING RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CATHOLIC CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE IN H.M. PRISONS AND YOUNG OFFENDER INSTITUTIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Willingham Baptist Church
George Street
WILLINGHAM
CB24 5LJ
- Phone:
- 07971 041897
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window