Accounts and annual returns TAMESIDE SPORTS TRUST

Charity number: 1074808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window