Gorkha Development Scheme

Charity number: 1069611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.76k £7.67k £8.88k £12.26k £11.00k
Total expenditure £4.05k £6.54k £6.99k £6.43k £6.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A