Accounts and annual returns TSAI LAU-CHI CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1069997
Charity reporting is overdue by 1462 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 1 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 1 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 367 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 367 days
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 732 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 732 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1097 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1097 days
Annual return 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1462 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1462 days