SUNDERLAND SPORTS FUND

Charity number: 1076973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To raise funds with the purpose of giving financial support for the benefit of young people who are under 25 years of age (exceptions to this age limit will be made for participants active in a paralympic sports category and coaches who receive direct financial assistance from the Fund) who are either members of a sports club or group, or who are talented sports individuals living or training w

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £413
Total expenditure: £244

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Sunderland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 August 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SUNDERLAND SPORTS COUNCIL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LES SCOTT Chair
None on record
Jeffrey Allen Brown Trustee 21 November 2024
None on record
Ashley Shield Trustee 21 November 2024
None on record
Councillor Fiona Miller Trustee 26 February 2015
None on record
Graeme Sidney Anderson Trustee 26 February 2015
None on record
KEITH LOWES Trustee 07 June 2013
SUNDERLAND DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
CHRISTINA ANNE SHORT JP Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.55k £5 £0 £5 £413
Total expenditure £3.91k £445 £2.99k £792 £244
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 Church Lane North
Murton
Seaham
SR7 9RJ
Phone:
01915262545