BAZIYA MISSION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity assists the Christian community of Baziya in the Eastern Cape, S Africa, financially mainly through the Moravian Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- South Africa
Governance
- 14 May 1998: Standard registration
- 30 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.17k | £2.59k | £2.84k | £3.38k | £3.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.03k | £0 | £530 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 10 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 18 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 26 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 28 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 APRIL 1998.
Charitable objects
TO MAKE GRANTS FROM TIME TO TIME FOR THE WELFARE OF THE CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BAZIYA NEAR UMTATA IN THE REPUBLIC OF SOUTH AFRICA.
Area of benefit
BAZIYA NEAR UMTATA IN THE REPUBLIC OF SOUTH AFRICA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window