THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF UPHOLDERS NEVILLE HAYMAN CHARITY

Charity number: 1071597
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £6.95k £7.99k £42.05k £18.31k £18.31k
Total expenditure £1.95k £5.29k £2.65k £3.55k £3.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A