SHOREDITCH TOWN HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1069617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jesse Jones Trustee 04 February 2019 None on record
Heather Deanna Clark Charrington Trustee 16 May 2019 None on record
James Pidgeon Trustee 19 July 2018 None on record
CAROLINE ROUTH Trustee 17 December 2012 None on record
STEPHEN NEAL ROBERTSON Chair 17 July 2014
TEXTILE REUSE AND INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT Received: On time
THE LONDON PATHWAY Received: On time
JONATHAN MCSHANE Trustee
ACTION ON SMOKING AND HEALTH (ASH) Received: On time
Tania Harrison Trustee 16 May 2019
DANCE UMBRELLA LIMITED Received: On time
Alexandra Katherine Mary Jeffreys Trustee 15 May 2019 None on record
PENNY WROUT Trustee 17 December 2012
HACKNEY PARISH ALMSHOUSES CHARITY Received: On time
Landen Prescott Brann Trustee 12 May 2021 None on record
Stephen Race Trustee 24 September 2018 None on record
MICHAEL DAVID BERG Trustee
THE H. CLUB CREATIVE FOUNDATION Overdue by 229 days