COMMUNITY HELP AND NEIGHBOURLY CARE FOR EVERYONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHANCE is a community based organisation, based in the heart of an identified high area of deprivation, offering activities to increase confidence, and self-esteem, via a programme of events and courses. Providing fun activities, which have an impact on social isolation, anti-social behaviour, criminal activities and enhance community cohesion. Our centre provides support and a training centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £18,970 from 18970 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sunderland
Governance
- 08 September 1998: Standard registration
- C.H.A.N.C.E. (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yvonne Dixon | Chair | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maropeng Mashangoane | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Duggan | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Moon | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diane Maven | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Stephen | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
FREDA GRAY | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANICE ATKINSON | Trustee | 14 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.46k | £123.00k | £86.43k | £110.80k | £135.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.86k | £92.26k | £85.23k | £105.76k | £121.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £17.50k | £17.18k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.84k | N/A | N/A | £36.98k | £18.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 February 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 February 2024 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 FEBRUARY 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 JULY 1998
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CENTRAL WARD EAST OF SANS STREET IN THE CITY OF SUNDERLAND AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS ON A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS (B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME, WHETHER DONE IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY IN FURTHERANCE OF THOSE OBJECTIVES (C) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
CENTRAL WARD EAST OF SANS STREET IN THE CITY OF SUNDERLAND AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 RICKABY STREET
SUNDERLAND
SR1 2DL
- Phone:
- 01915670978
- Email:
- info.chance1993@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window