STEPPING STONES COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1069962
Charity reporting is overdue by 714 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 348 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 348 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 714 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 714 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 13 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 13 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 06 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 07 June 2016 On time