AQA EDUCATION

Charity number: 1073334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £169.09m £165.81m £187.03m £190.96m £135.85m
Total expenditure £206.15m £140.30m £162.33m £170.71m £132.97m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £657.07k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £5.81m £4.91m £2.27m
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £180.30m £183.89m £132.37m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £776.00k £923.00k £2.17m £1.21m
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £138.90m £144.95m £149.50m £113.74m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £142.88k £66.00k £98.00k £130.49k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £379.12k £343.00k £476.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £142.88k £66.00k £98.00k £130.49k
Expenditure - Other N/A £1.26m £17.32m £21.12m £19.10m