AQA EDUCATION

Charity number: 1073334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amina Bibi Ali Modan Trustee 23 January 2020 None on record
Lara Rolande Elda Martini Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Philippa Jane Hird Trustee 01 April 2015 None on record
James Edward Lenygon Dahl Trustee 20 January 2020
THE OLD WELLINGTONIAN SOCIETY CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Professor Mariann Rand-Weaver Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Nadeem Kiyani Trustee 05 July 2017 None on record
Deirdre Mary O'Donoghue Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Colin Hughes Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
ELIZABETH KITCATT Trustee 01 April 2017
YOUNG ENTERPRISE Received: On time
Isabel Mary Sutcliffe Trustee 05 March 2020 None on record
MARTIN GUY TURNER Trustee 05 July 2017 None on record
Dr Ali Hadawi Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
SUSAN MARGARET MOORE Trustee 18 April 2013 None on record
Justin James Van Wijngaarden Chair 01 April 2015 None on record
MR MIKE NICHOLSON Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record