FRIENDS OF HARTING CHURCH

Charity number: 1070242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Judy Stuart Entress Trustee 06 October 2016 None on record
SELINA MARY THISTLETON-SMITH Trustee 09 April 2014 None on record
Sarah Anne Wilcox Trustee 06 October 2014 None on record
Etta Ferrier Trustee 10 July 2019 None on record
MICHAEL EDWARD HODGSON Chair 03 July 2012
FRIENDS OF HARTING CHURCH ENDOWMENT FUND Received: On time
Peter Wolsey Harris Trustee 06 October 2016 None on record
Francis Bertram Chandler de Beer Trustee 07 October 2011
TANGMERE MILITARY AVIATION MUSEUM TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
FRIENDS OF HARTING CHURCH ENDOWMENT FUND Received: On time