Accounts and annual returns WEST HEATH 2000

Charity number: 1069677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 16 May 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 26 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 July 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 07 July 2021 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 23 July 2019 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 23 July 2019 23 days late Download Open in new window