Trustees WEST HEATH 2000

Charity number: 1069677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pauline Louise Knutton Chair 08 October 2015
None on record
Richard Streatfeild Trustee 15 July 2022
None on record
Robin William Trevor Apps Trustee 15 July 2022
None on record
Wendy Jane Keeping Trustee 15 July 2022
None on record
Margaret Heath Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Joanne Flanagan Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Damian Patrick Deeney Trustee 16 October 2020
None on record
Helen Marie McClure Trustee 16 October 2020
None on record
Marina Evelyn Ann Housley Trustee 07 December 2018
None on record