Financial history ST MICHAEL'S C.E. (C) PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND (LICHFIELD)

Charity number: 1069868
Charity reporting is overdue by 296 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £16.97k £6.72k £5.72k £1.04k £1
Total expenditure £20.85k £6.07k £6.06k £1.58k £2.76k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A