Trustees Stella Maris

Charity number: 1069833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev David Burke Trustee 24 March 2021
None on record
John Stanley Hood Trustee 24 March 2021
None on record
James Muir Trustee 07 July 2020
None on record
Maria Lourdes Crowe Trustee 07 July 2020
None on record
Rev Edward Nicholas Hugh Gilbert Bishop Trustee 02 April 2020
None on record
William Ogbonna Azuh Trustee 01 December 2018
None on record
Luisa Campbell Trustee 01 December 2018
None on record
Esteban Pacha Trustee 19 June 2018
None on record
Theresa Crossley Trustee 27 March 2018
None on record
James Gosling Trustee 07 December 2017
None on record
Rt Rev Paul James Mason Trustee 23 March 2017
THE VICARIATE HEADQUARTERS TRUST
Received: On time
SAFE SPACES ENGLAND AND WALES
Recently registered
THE ARMY ROMAN CATHOLIC TRUST
Received: On time
ROYAL NAVY (ROMAN CATHOLIC) TRUST
Received: On time
ROYAL AIR FORCE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH PURPOSES FUND
Received: On time
Robert Ashdown Trustee 23 June 2016
None on record