HOME-START EAST NORTHANTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start offers free support, friendship and practical help to families with at least one child under five who are experiencing difficult times. Families are visited regularly in their own homes by carefully selected, trained and supported volunteers who have all had experience of parenting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 05 June 1998: Standard registration
- 14 July 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 14 July 2015: Funds transferred to 1154210 Encompass
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.14k | £48.46k | £58.59k | £56.11k | £42.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.53k | £63.37k | £57.78k | £57.91k | £51.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 05 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 05 November 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 11 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 19 December 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 05 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 27 November 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH JANUARY 1998
Charitable objects
(A) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN (B) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN (C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENT OF CHILDREN (D) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN THE AREA OF EAST NORTHANTS AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
EAST NORTHANTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window