BRITISH EX-SERVICES WHEELCHAIR SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1071226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 09 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 09 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 25 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 08 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 28 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 19 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 30 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 03 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 27 October 2016 On time Download