FRIENDS OF RAVENSCLIFFE HIGH SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide finanacial assistance in support of students needs outside that provided by school capitation provision.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Calderdale
Governance
- 01 October 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel English | Chair | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Joyce | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Campbell | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Harris | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Aspin | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judy Jackson | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Finder | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Kennedy | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JO HAGUE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA RHODES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.94k | £21.97k | £7.30k | £9.60k | £18.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £324 | £1.54k | £48.56k | £7.36k | £9.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 MARCH 1998 AS AMENDED 7 SEPTEMBER 1998 AND 14TH NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
RAVENSCLIFFE HIGH SCHOOL
SKIRCOAT GREEN
HX3 0RZ
- Phone:
- 01422358621
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window