BE YOUR BEST FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1077291
Charity is insolvent
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 183 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 183 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 548 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 548 days
Annual return 31 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 914 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 914 days
Annual return 31 July 2017 08 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 08 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 03 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 03 May 2017 On time Download