BRECKNOCK AND RADNOR CROSSROADS - CARING FOR CARERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CARER RESPITE SERVICES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY-BASED SUPPORT WORKERS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Powys
Governance
- 07 September 1998: Standard registration
- 01 June 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BRECKNOCK AND RADNOR CROSSROADS (Working name)
- BRECKNOCK AND RADNOR CROSSROADS LIMITED (Previous name)
- BRECKNOCK CROSSROADS CARE ATTENDANT SCHEME LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £303.19k | £306.53k | £408.00k | £311.42k | £267.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £267.20k | £298.71k | £353.45k | £311.90k | £297.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 17 February 2009 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 22 May 2009 | 111 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 05 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 16 November 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 30 April 2007 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 18 April 2007 | 77 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 16 May 2006 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 16 May 2006 | 105 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 APRIL 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 AUGUST 1998, AS AMENDED 20 JUNE 2001, AS AMENDED 20 DECEMBER 2001,
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY CARERS, AND CHILDREN AND ADULTS WHO HAVE CARE NEEDS, AS A RESULT OF DISABILITY, ILLNESS OR AGE BY OFFERING A RESPITE SERVICE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY BASED SUPPORT WORKERS.
Area of benefit
BRECKNOCK AND RADNOR
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window