CATTERICK VILLAGE SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Association are to provide for the inhabitants of Catterick Village and the neighbourhood in the interests of social welfare, for the facilities for recreation and leisure time occupation, for the purpose of relaxation and with the object of improving the life for the said inhabitants. To cooperate with local authorities to provide an organisation to achieve these objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
Total income includes £3,217 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 11 November 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIANE SARAH KIRKHAM | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Jason James Thompson | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Darren Anthony Rhodes | Trustee | 18 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ROBSON | Trustee | 13 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.97k | £30.32k | £36.43k | £29.10k | £19.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.03k | £11.99k | £47.04k | £37.84k | £20.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.33k | £16.34k | £1.40k | £1.44k | £3.22k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 13 JANUARY 1997
Charitable objects
A PLAYING FIELD AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CATTERICK VILLAGE
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CATTERICK VILLAGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
67C High Street
Catterick
RICHMOND
North Yorkshire
DL10 7LL
- Phone:
- +447720237153
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window