Accounts and annual returns WOODSTOCK GIRLS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1070724
Charity reporting is overdue by 1784 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 323 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 323 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 688 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 688 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1053 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1053 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1418 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1418 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1784 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1784 days